EP4329628 - CIRCULATORY SYSTEM ASSESSMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLIVIER, Antoine 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
PRABHU, David 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
RAFTER, Patrick Gabriels 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
SOMPHONE, Oudom 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
RAYNAUD, Caroline Denise Francoise 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
GONCALVES, Alexandra 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22722282.5 | 15.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022EP60161 | Priority number, date | EP20210290024 | 29.04.2021 Original published format: EP 21290024 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022228919 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4329628 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/00, G06N3/04, G16H30/40, G16H50/30, G16H50/20 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A61B8/0883 (EP);
A61B8/5223 (EP);
G16H30/40 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B8/463 (EP);
A61B8/469 (EP);
A61B8/483 (EP);
G06N3/044 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | BEURTEILUNG EINES KREISLAUFSYSTEMS | [2024/10] | English: | CIRCULATORY SYSTEM ASSESSMENT | [2024/10] | French: | ÉVALUATION DU SYSTÈME CIRCULATOIRE | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 29.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2018333104 (SITEK ARKADIUSZ [US]) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0141] * * paragraph [0144] * * paragraph [0147] * * paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0170] ** figures 2A-8A * | by applicant | - SIMARD et al., "Sex-Related Discordance Between Aortic Valve Calcification and Hemodynamic Severity of Aortic Stenosis", Circulation Research, (20170000), vol. 120, pages 681 - 691 | - CLAVEL et al., "The Complex Nature of Discordant Severe Calcified Aortic Valve Disease Grading", JACC, (20130000), vol. 62, no. 24, doi:10.1016/j.jacc.2013.08.1621, pages 2329 - 38, XP028798240 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2013.08.1621 |