EP4323102 - MODULAR REACTOR CONFIGURATION FOR PRODUCTION OF CHEMICALS WITH ELECTRICAL HEATING FOR CARRYING OUT REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATNAKAR, Ram Ratan Houston, TX 77082 / US | 02 /
BALAKOTAIAH, Vemuri Houston, 77004 / US | 03 /
HARVEY III, Albert Destrehan Houston, TX 77082-3101 / US | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Shell Legal Services IP PO Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22723043.0 | 13.04.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022EP59896 | Priority number, date | US202163175384P | 15.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163175384 P | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022219053 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4323102 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
B01J19/0013 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/32 (KR,US);
B01J2219/0002 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/00038 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/0004 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00135 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | MODULARE REAKTORKONFIGURATION ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHEMIKALIEN MIT ELEKTRISCHER BEHEIZUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON REAKTIONEN | [2024/08] | English: | MODULAR REACTOR CONFIGURATION FOR PRODUCTION OF CHEMICALS WITH ELECTRICAL HEATING FOR CARRYING OUT REACTIONS | [2024/08] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE RÉACTEUR MODULAIRE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES AVEC CHAUFFAGE ÉLECTRIQUE POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE RÉACTIONS | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 10.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0246676 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]); | [XA]WO2013135699 (BAYER IP GMBH [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2019228798 (HALDOR TOPSOE AS [DK]) | by applicant | US2016288074 | US2017106360 |