EP4329644 - SEALER - DIVIDER - DISSECTOR AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bolder Surgical, LLC 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEKETEE, Nathan Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | 02 /
CROWLEY, Timothy Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | 03 /
DEBORSKI, Christopher Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | 04 /
HEMPSTEAD, Russell Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | 05 /
SMITH, Ryan Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | 06 /
TWOMEY, John Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Gillespie, Richard Inventorship Suite 10050 5 Fitzwilliam Square Dublin 2, D02 R744 / IE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22724189.0 | 28.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022US26779 | Priority number, date | US202163180782P | 28.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163180782 P | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022232426 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4329644 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/29, A61B18/14 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B18/1445 (EP);
A61B18/1482 (EP);
A61B2017/2919 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2922 (EP);
A61B2017/2929 (EP);
A61B2017/2947 (US);
A61B2018/00196 (EP);
A61B2018/0063 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | VERSIEGELUNGSTEILER-DISSEKTOR UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2024/10] | English: | SEALER - DIVIDER - DISSECTOR AND RELATED METHODS | [2024/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SCELLEMENT - SÉPARATEUR - DISSECTEUR ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 24.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5308357 (LICHTMAN PHILIP R [US]) [A] 1-23* figure - *; | [A]US5618306 (ROTH ALEX T [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 50; figures 1A-2C *; | [XI]US2007106297 (DUMBAULD PATRICK L [US], et al) [X] 1,12-22 * paragraphs [0028] , [ 102] - [0134] * * figures 1A-3D * * figures 9A-10B * [I] 2-11,23 | by applicant | US9144455 | US10342599 | US10765471 |