EP4109918 - ELECTRONIC ELEMENT CONNECTION STRUCTURE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Jiuliang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 03 /
LV, Yan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 04 /
HUANG, Yunchun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 05 /
YANG, Sen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22724222.9 | 14.01.2022 | [2022/52] | WO2022CN72165 | Priority number, date | CN202120944650U | 30.04.2021 Original published format: CN 202120944650 U | CN202121343155U | 16.06.2021 Original published format: CN 202121343155 U | [2022/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022227718 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109918 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.11.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/52, H04B1/3816 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (US);
H01Q1/52 (EP,US);
H04B1/3816 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/52] | H04Q1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE KOMPONENTE UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/52] | English: | ELECTRONIC ELEMENT CONNECTION STRUCTURE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/52] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CONNEXION D'ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2022 | Translation filed | 27.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4682180 (GANS MICHAEL J [US]); | [XAI]WO2020082361 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [XAI]US2020335850 (OH SANGGI [KR], et al); | International search | [A]US2014078018 (WONG KIN-LU [TW], et al); | [A]CN204155964U (AU OPTRONICS CORP); | [X]CN107454215 (JRD COMMUNICATION SHENZHEN CO LTD); | [A]CN110061038 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]CN110635234 (UNIVERSAL GLOBAL TECH KUNSHAN CO LTD); | [A]CN111836507 (A DATA TECH CO LTD) |