EP4326767 - AN ANTI-TSLP FAB WITH IMPROVED STABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MedImmune Limited 1 Francis Crick Avenue Cambridge Biomedical Campus Cambridge CB2 0AA / GB | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLBECK, Roland Wilhelm Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | 02 /
COHEN, Emma Suzanne Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 0AA / GB | 03 /
HUNTINGTON, Catherine Eugenie Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB21 6GH / GB | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22724429.0 | 19.04.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022EP60236 | Priority number, date | EP20210169183 | 19.04.2021 Original published format: EP 21169183 | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022223514 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4326767 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/24, A61K39/395, A61P11/06, A61P29/00, A61P31/04, A61P37/04 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
C07K16/244 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P11/06 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P31/04 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P37/04 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
C07K2317/21 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/522 (EP,IL);
C07K2317/55 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/92 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/94 (EP,IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Extension states | BA | 09.11.2023 | ME | 09.11.2023 | Validation states | MA | 09.11.2023 | TN | 09.11.2023 | Title | German: | ANTI-TSLP-FAB MIT VERBESSERTER STABILITÄT | [2024/09] | English: | AN ANTI-TSLP FAB WITH IMPROVED STABILITY | [2024/09] | French: | FAB ANTI-TSLP À STABILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 09.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018191479 (AMGEN INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2021043221 (BIOSION INC [CN], et al); | [XP]WO2021083908 (MEDIMMUNE LTD [GB]) | by applicant | US2002123057 | WO02096948 |