EP4327432 - ENERGY SUPPLY SYSTEM HAVING BATTERY MODULES, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ENERGY SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Instagrid GmbH Hermann-Hagenmeyer-Str. 1 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNING, Sebastain 70597 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
HEZARIYAN, Reza 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstraße 87 50968 Köln / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22725816.7 | 26.04.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022EP61097 | Priority number, date | DE202110111866 | 06.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021111866 | [2024/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022233646 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4327432 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4327432 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H02M7/483, H02M1/32 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H02J7/0016 (EP);
H02J7/0031 (US);
H02J7/0013 (US);
H02J7/0063 (EP);
H02J7/007182 (US);
H02J7/007194 (US);
|
Former IPC [2024/09] | H02J7/00, H02M7/483 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM MIT BATTERIEMODULEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSSYSTEMS | [2024/09] | English: | ENERGY SUPPLY SYSTEM HAVING BATTERY MODULES, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ENERGY SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2024/09] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE COMPRENANT DES MODULES DE BATTERIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2023 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 10.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2017062793 (ZAKHARYAN KAGUM G [US], et al); | [YA]DE102019110177 (INSTAGRID GMBH [DE]) | Examination | DE102008021542 | by applicant | US8994336 | DE102019110177 |