EP4334997 - BATTERY SYSTEM, BATTERY MODULE AND BATTERY STRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Instagrid GmbH Hermann-Hagenmeyer-Str. 1 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEDLMAYR, Andreas 76179 Pforzheim / DE | 02 /
CARLSON, Rachel Dias 70569 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
RIEGRAF, Robert 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstraße 87 50968 Köln / DE | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 22726018.9 | 27.04.2022 | [2024/11] | WO2022EP61159 | Priority number, date | DE202110111863 | 06.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021111863 | [2024/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022233667 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4334997 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/204, H01M50/247, H01M50/271, H01M50/503, H01M50/569 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
H01M50/204 (EP);
H01M50/213 (US);
H01M50/247 (EP,US);
H01M50/271 (EP);
H01M50/503 (EP);
H01M50/519 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | BATTERIESYSTEM, BATTERIEMODUL UND BATTERIESTRING | [2024/11] | English: | BATTERY SYSTEM, BATTERY MODULE AND BATTERY STRING | [2024/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE, MODULE DE BATTERIE ET CHAÎNE DE BATTERIE | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 04.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE102011081573 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6,7 * paragraphs [0019] , [0033] , [0036] , [0047] - [0061]; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US2014220391 (FUJII KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 25 * paragraphs [0041] - [0044] - [0 63]; figures 1,5 *; | [Y]DE102014206646 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0021] , [0072] , [0085]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2017005376 (HARRIS W PORTER [US], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0039] , [0040]; figure 6A *; | [XY]US2017187077 (MCCARTNEY TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,13,15,17 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0021] - [0032]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 6,7,9-12; | [XY]US2020006722 (TANNER JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,13-16 * paragraphs [0015] - [0027]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 6,7,9-12; | [Y]US2020014008 (BENDE MIKLOS [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0019]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE102018126205 (FIDEO GROUP GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12* paragraph [0078]; figure 7 * |