EP4334688 - DEVICE FOR THE SPECTRALLY RESOLVED DETECTION OF OPTICAL RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4D Photonics GmbH Burgwedeler Straße 27a 30916 Isernhagen / DE | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANZ, Christoph 30900 Negenborn / DE | 02 /
BRUCHWALD, Oliver 31515 Wunstorf / DE | 03 /
FUNCK, Max 14482 Potsdam / DE | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Werner, André Kaufmann Patent- und Markenanwälte Loschwitzer Straße 42 01309 Dresden / DE | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 22726257.3 | 02.05.2022 | [2024/11] | WO2022DE100328 | Priority number, date | DE202110111892 | 06.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021111892 | [2024/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022233363 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4334688 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/02, G01J3/18, G01J3/28, G01J3/36, G01J5/00, G01J5/0801, G01J5/60 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
G01J5/60 (EP,KR);
G01J5/0801 (EP,KR,US);
G01J3/0291 (EP,KR);
G01J3/1804 (EP,KR);
G01J3/2803 (EP,KR);
G01J3/36 (EP,KR);
G01J5/0018 (EP,KR,US);
G01J5/0806 (US);
G01J5/0814 (US);
G01J5/22 (US);
G01J5/601 (US);
G01J2005/202 (US);
G01J2005/607 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SPEKTRAL AUFGELÖSTEN ERFASSUNG OPTISCHER STRAHLUNG | [2024/11] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE SPECTRALLY RESOLVED DETECTION OF OPTICAL RADIATION | [2024/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION À RÉSOLUTION SPECTRALE D'UN RAYONNEMENT OPTIQUE | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 17.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |