EP4337450 - A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL PRINTED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elkem Silicones USA Corp. Two Tower Center Boulevard Suite 1802 East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | For all designated states Elkem Silicones France SAS 21 avenue Georges Pompidou 69003 Lyon / FR | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCES, Jean-Marc 69330 Meyzieu / FR | 02 /
THIRIA, Remi Fort Mill, South Carolina 29708 / US | 03 /
KIHARA, Matthew Camarillo, California 93010 / US | 04 /
PRICE, Brian Rock Hill, South Carolina 29730 / US | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Garcia Escomel, Cristina Elkem Silicones France SAS 9, rue Spécia 69190 Saint-Fons / FR | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22726944.6 | 11.05.2022 | [2024/12] | WO2022US28728 | Priority number, date | US202163187628P | 12.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163187628 P | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022240961 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4337450 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/124, C08L83/06 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
B29C64/106 (EP);
B29C64/314 (KR);
B29C64/129 (US);
B29C64/124 (KR);
B29C64/245 (KR);
B29C64/264 (KR,US);
B33Y10/00 (KR,US);
B33Y30/00 (KR);
B33Y40/00 (KR);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
C01B33/14 (US);
C08L83/06 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2033/08 (US);
B29K2083/00 (KR);
B29K2105/0094 (US);
B29K2105/16 (US);
B29K2509/02 (US);
B29K2995/0088 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L83/06, C08K3/36, C08K5/53, C08L83/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN GEDRUCKTEN ARTIKELS | [2024/12] | English: | A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL PRINTED ARTICLE | [2024/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN ARTICLE IMPRIMÉ TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 12.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2018234643 (ELKEM SILICONES FRANCE SAS [FR], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 42] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0026] *; | [Y]WO2019241731 (BASE SE [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * Formulae 10-8 and 10-9; paragraphs [0067] , [0091] - [0092] * * paragraphs [0049] - [0050] - [0059] *; | [Y] - SIRRINE JUSTIN M ET AL, "Functional siloxanes with photo-activated, simultaneous chain extension and crosslinking for lithography-based 3D printing", POLYMER, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180224), vol. 152, doi:10.1016/J.POLYMER.2018.02.056, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 25 - 34, XP085478518 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * Page 25 right column - page 26 left column * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2018.02.056 | by applicant | FR2320324 | EP0462032 | FR2764894 | US2008004464 | US2014131908 | WO2014108364 | WO2014126837 | WO2015107333 | WO2015197495 | WO2016044547 | WO2016071241 | US2016168177 | WO2016109819 | WO2016134972 | WO2016140891 | WO2016181149 | WO2016188930 | WO2017040874 | WO2018206689 | WO2018234643 | US2020071525 |