EP4110642 - STEERING WHEEL HAVING A HUB WHICH IS ROTATABLE WITH RESPECT TO A JACKET TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mercedes-Benz Group AG Mercedesstraße 120 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Mei 69124 Heidelberg / DE | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2023/34] |
Former [2023/01] | Meidert, Joerg-Michael Mercede-Benz Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG 063- H512 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 22727042.8 | 29.04.2022 | [2023/01] | WO2022EP61554 | Priority number, date | DE20211002596 | 18.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021002596 | [2023/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022243013 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4110642 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4110642 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60K35/00, B62D1/04, B60K37/06 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP);
B60K35/22 (EP);
B60K35/60 (EP);
B60K35/654 (EP);
B60K2360/1438 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] |
Former [2023/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LENKRAD MIT EINER GEGENÜBER EINEM MANTELROHR DREHBAREN NABE | [2023/01] | English: | STEERING WHEEL HAVING A HUB WHICH IS ROTATABLE WITH RESPECT TO A JACKET TUBE | [2023/01] | French: | VOLANT DE DIRECTION DOTÉ D'UN MOYEU POUVANT TOURNER PAR RAPPORT À UN TUBE DE CHEMISE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 19.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014062891 (POWELL PATRICK [US]) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102014205707 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102015200907 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0070]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102019212507 (JOYSON SAFETY SYSTEMS GERMANY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO0158713 | DE10214606 | DE102019211657 |