EP4305810 - METHOD OF ONBOARDING A USER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAHR, Michael 81827 München / DE | 02 /
FALK, Rainer 85435 Erding / DE | 03 /
FRIES, Steffen 85598 Baldham / DE | 04 /
WALEWSKI, Joachim 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22727110.3 | 03.05.2022 | [2024/03] | WO2022EP61827 | Priority number, date | EP20210172056 | 04.05.2021 Original published format: EP 21172056 | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022233857 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4305810 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04W12/30, H04W12/63, H04W12/71, H04W12/069, H04W4/70 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H04L63/0823 (EP);
H04W12/06 (US);
H04L63/102 (EP);
H04W12/35 (EP);
H04W12/63 (EP);
H04W12/71 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ONBOARDING EINER BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG | [2024/03] | English: | METHOD OF ONBOARDING A USER DEVICE | [2024/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PROVISIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF UTILISATEUR | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2023 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 12.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2019156716 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [X]WO2021061419 (AMAZON TECH INC [US]); |