EP4228951 - FLOOR STRUCTURE FOR A PASSENGER CAR, AND MODULAR SYSTEM FOR A BODY OF AN AUTOMOBILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mercedes-Benz Group AG Mercedesstraße 120 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARL, Michael 70839 Gerlingen / DE | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Thoms, Frank Daimler Brand & IP Management GmbH & Co. KG 063 - H512 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 22727281.2 | 03.05.2022 | [2023/34] | WO2022EP61756 | Priority number, date | DE20211002367 | 04.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021002367 | [2023/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022233812 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4228951 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15, B62D25/02, B62D25/20, B60K1/04 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
B62D25/2036 (EP);
B62D21/157 (EP,US);
B62D25/025 (EP,US);
B60K1/04 (EP);
B60K2001/0438 (EP);
B60R16/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | BODENSTRUKTUR FÜR EINEN PERSONENKRAFTWAGEN UND BAUKASTENSYSTEM FÜR EINE KAROSSERIE EINES KRAFTWAGENS | [2023/34] | English: | FLOOR STRUCTURE FOR A PASSENGER CAR, AND MODULAR SYSTEM FOR A BODY OF AN AUTOMOBILE | [2023/34] | French: | STRUCTURE DE PLANCHER POUR UNE VOITURE PARTICULIÈRE ET SYSTÈME MODULAIRE POUR UNE CARROSSERIE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 16.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2010208473 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP); | [XA]JP2010274848 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]US2011049937 (FUJII TAKAYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2017050675 (KELLNER PHILIPP [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2019059821 (GESTAMP HARDTECH AB [SE]); | [A]US2020262491 (SHANNON RYAN [US], et al); | [XI]WO2021071410 (GESTAMP HARDTECH AB [SE]) | by applicant | EP2468609 |