EP4334481 - PROCESS UTILIZING SYNTHESIS GAS FOR IMPROVING THE ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT OF THE REDUCTION OF IRON ORE IN BLAST FURNACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEXTCHEM TECH S.p.A. Via di Vannina 88/94 00156 Rome / IT | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASINI, Luca Eugenio Riccardo 20129 Milano / IT | 02 /
IAQUANIELLO, Gaetano 00153 Roma / IT | 03 /
SALLADINI, Annarita 64026 Roseto degli Abruzzi (TE) / IT | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Zanoli, Enrico, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 22727766.2 | 02.05.2022 | [2024/11] | WO2022EP61672 | Priority number, date | IT20210011189 | 03.05.2021 Original published format: IT202100011189 | [2024/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022233769 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4334481 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C21B5/00, C21B5/06, C21B7/00, C21B13/00 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
C21B5/001 (EP,US);
C21B13/0073 (EP);
C21B5/06 (EP,US);
C21B7/002 (EP,US);
C21B2005/005 (EP,US);
C21B2100/22 (EP,US);
C21B2100/24 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER UMWELTBELASTUNG DURCH REDUKTION VON EISENERZ IN HOCHÖFEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SYNTHESEGAS | [2024/11] | English: | PROCESS UTILIZING SYNTHESIS GAS FOR IMPROVING THE ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT OF THE REDUCTION OF IRON ORE IN BLAST FURNACES | [2024/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DE GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE POUR AMÉLIORER L'IMPACT ENVIRONNEMENTAL DE LA RÉDUCTION DE MINERAI DE FER DANS DES HAUTS FOURNEAUX | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]KR20070067830 (RES INST IND SCIENCE & TECH [KR]); | [XI]EP2543743 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]); | [XI]JP2014028984 (JFE STEEL CORP); | [X]CN106139838B ; | [AD]CA3112531 (ENI SPA [IT]) | by applicant | WO9737929 | US5856585 | WO03099712 | WO2005023710 | WO2006034868 | WO2007045457 | WO2009065559 | WO2009127512 | WO2011072877 | WO2011151082 | WO2016016257 | WO2016016256 | WO2016016253 | WO2016016251 | WO2020058859 |