EP4342242 - ON-DEMAND POSITIONING REFERENCE SIGNAL SCHEDULING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YERRAMALLI, Srinivas San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
MANOLAKOS, Alexandros San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
KUMAR, Mukesh San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/13] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 22727998.1 | 12.04.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022US24347 | Priority number, date | IN202141022379 | 19.05.2021 Original published format: IN202141022379 | [2024/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022245449 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4342242 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, G01S5/02, G01S5/10, H04W4/02 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,KR,US);
G01S5/0205 (EP);
G01S5/0215 (EP);
G01S5/0236 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0048 (KR);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04W24/08 (KR);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W4/023 (EP);
H04W4/024 (EP);
H04W72/231 (KR);
H04W72/563 (KR);
H04W76/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | ON-DEMAND-PLANUNG VON POSITIONIERUNGSREFERENZSIGNALEN | [2024/13] | English: | ON-DEMAND POSITIONING REFERENCE SIGNAL SCHEDULING | [2024/13] | French: | PLANIFICATION DE SIGNAUX DE RÉFÉRENCE DE POSITIONNEMENT À LA DEMANDE | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 12.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2012040687 (SIOMINA IANA [SE], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraphs [0006] - [0035] - [0051] - [0163]; figures 1-10d *; | [X]US2014094188 (KAZMI MUHAMMAD ALI [SE], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraphs [0041] - [0209]; figures 1-23 *; | [XP]WO2022031974 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [XP] 1-30* paragraphs [0051] , [0070] - [0340]; figures 1A-9 *; | [X] - INTERDIGITAL INC, "Discussion on potential positioning enhancements", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20201026 - 20201113, (20201016), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2008491, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_103-e/Docs/R1-2008491.zip R1-2008491_103e_POS_853_ENH_SUBMIT.docx, (20201016), XP051940175 [X] 1-30 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * | by applicant | - 3GPP Technical Specification (TS) 38.455 | - 3GPP TS 36.455 | - 3GPP TS 36.355 | - 3GPP TS 38.133 |