EP4337726 - POLYAMIDES AND CORRESPONDING POLYMER COMPOSITIONS AND ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Specialty Polymers USA, LLC. 4500 McGinnis Ferry Road Alpharetta, GA 30005-3914 / US | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTRAND, Arthur René Henri 69360 Communay / FR | 02 /
JEOL, Stéphane 69230 Saint-Genis-Laval / FR | 03 /
FLORES, Joel Alpharetta, GA 30004 / US | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Senninger, Thierry Specialty Operations France Intellectual Assets Management 52, rue de la Haie Coq 93308 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/12] | Senninger, Thierry Rhodia Opérations Intellectual Assets Management 52 rue de la Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 22728601.0 | 11.05.2022 | [2024/12] | WO2022EP62847 | Priority number, date | EP20210305605 | 11.05.2021 Original published format: EP 21305605 | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022238511 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4337726 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/06, C08G69/26 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
C08G69/265 (EP,KR,US);
A61L15/26 (KR);
A61L27/18 (KR);
A61L29/06 (KR);
A61L31/06 (KR);
A61L33/068 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | POLYAMIDE UND ENTSPRECHENDE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ARTIKEL | [2024/12] | English: | POLYAMIDES AND CORRESPONDING POLYMER COMPOSITIONS AND ARTICLES | [2024/12] | French: | POLYAMIDES ET COMPOSITIONS ET ARTICLES POLYMÈRES CORRESPONDANTS | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 21.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2965616 (CALDWELL JOHN R, et al); | [XAI]DE1520924 (SCHOLVEN CHEMIE AG); | [I]JP2003261766 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [XA]CN107383369 (YANGZHOU CHENXIN NEW MATERIAL TECH CO LTD); | [XAI]US2018251599 (AEPLI ETIENNE [CH], et al) | by applicant | US2965616 | DE1520924 | JP2003261766 | CN107383369 | EP20210305605 |