EP4150630 - CONTROL ACCESS VERIFICATION OF A HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cilag GmbH International Gubelstrasse 34 6300 Zug / CH | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELTON, IV, Frederick E. Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 02 /
FIEBIG, Kevin M. Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 03 /
HARRIS, Jason L. Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 22729812.2 | 25.05.2022 | [2023/12] | WO2022IB54909 | Priority number, date | US202163194675P | 28.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163194675 P | US202117335362 | 01.06.2021 Original published format: US202117335362 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022249102 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4150630 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/40, G16H40/63, G16H40/67 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
G16H40/63 (EP);
G16H20/40 (EP);
G16H40/67 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | KONTROLLZUGANGSÜBERPRÜFUNG EINES GESUNDHEITSPFLICHTIGEN PROFESSIONELLEN | [2023/12] | English: | CONTROL ACCESS VERIFICATION OF A HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONAL | [2023/12] | French: | VÉRIFICATION D'ACCÈS À LA COMMANDE D'UN PROFESSIONNEL DE SANTÉ | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 14.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2017086926 (AMLING MARC R [US]); | [XI]US2021015554 (CHOW ANDRE [GB], et al) | by applicant | US2014263552 | US9345481 | US2017296213 | US2019200844 | US2019201137 | US2019206569 | US19380173357 | US20240171563 | US20070162094 |