EP4188666 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING MULTILAYER COMPOSITE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palitzsch, Wolfram Heinrich Heine Str. 1c 09599 Freiberg / DE | For all designated states Röver, Ingo Donatsgasse 4 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Rumrich, Gabriele Patentanwältin Limbacher Strasse 305 09116 Chemnitz / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 22730051.4 | 14.04.2022 | [2023/23] | WO2022DE100292 | Priority number, date | DE202110109591 | 16.04.2021 Original published format: DE102021109591 | [2023/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022218481 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4188666 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/02, B29B17/04, H01L31/048, B26F3/00, B02C19/06, B29L9/00 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
B29B17/02 (EP);
B26F3/004 (EP);
B29B17/04 (EP);
H01L31/048 (EP);
B29B2017/0428 (EP);
B29L2009/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRENNEN VON MULTISCHICHTVERBUNDMATERIALIEN | [2023/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING MULTILAYER COMPOSITE MATERIALS | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR SÉPARER DES MATÉRIAUX COMPOSITES MULTICOUCHE | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 27.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |