EP4341841 - AUTOMATED INTERPRETED APPLICATION CONTROL FOR WORKLOADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Virsec Systems, Inc. 226 Airport Parkway, Suite 350 San Jose CA 95110 / US | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Satya, V. San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Cobbold, Alistair John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22730352.6 | 18.05.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022US72417 | Priority number, date | US202163190100P | 18.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163190100 P | US202163190099P | 18.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163190099 P | [2024/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022246437 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4341841 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/56, G06F21/12, G06F21/31, G06F21/51, G06F21/57 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
G06F21/562 (EP,US);
G06F21/563 (US);
G06F21/566 (EP,US);
G06F21/577 (EP,US);
H04L63/1433 (EP);
G06F2221/033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE INTERPRETIERTE ANWENDUNGSSTEUERUNG FÜR ARBEITSLASTEN | [2024/13] | English: | AUTOMATED INTERPRETED APPLICATION CONTROL FOR WORKLOADS | [2024/13] | French: | COMMANDE D'APPLICATION INTERPRÉTÉE AUTOMATISÉE POUR CHARGES DE TRAVAIL | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 05.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2017288878 (LEE CHANG-WOO [KR], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0105] * * figure 6 *; | [I]US2019286833 (TAKUMI SHINYA [JP], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0082] *; | [A] - "Secure execution of privileged scripts ED - Darl Kuhn", IP.COM, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20090918), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013134389 [A] 1-20 * page 2 * | by applicant | US20000631901 |