EP4341658 - ADAPTATION DEVICE FOR COUPLING AT LEAST ONE SENSOR TO A TUBE SLEEVE WALL OF A TUBE FOR FLUID MEASUREMENT, AND SENSOR DEVICE HAVING AN ADAPTATION DEVICE OF THIS TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAUMEDIC AG 95213 Münchberg / DE | For all designated states REHAU Industries SE & Co. KG Helmut-Wagner-Straße 1 95111 Rehau / DE | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHRENPFORDT, Ricardo 08056 Zwickau / DE | 02 /
STÖCKER, Martin 95233 Helmbrechts / DE | 03 /
FESTEL, Tobias 95234 Sparneck / DE | 04 /
RUHLAND, Thomas 95444 Bayreuth / DE | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22730360.9 | 11.05.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022EP62776 | Priority number, date | DE202110204971 | 17.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021204971 | [2024/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022243131 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4341658 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/00, G01D11/30, A61B5/00, A61M1/36 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
G01D11/30 (EP);
G01L19/0038 (US);
A61B5/01 (EP);
A61B5/0215 (EP);
A61B5/6866 (EP);
A61M1/3639 (EP);
G01K1/14 (US);
G01L19/0023 (EP);
A61B2560/0223 (EP);
A61B2562/225 (EP);
A61B5/0075 (EP);
A61B5/02156 (EP);
A61M1/36224 (US);
A61M2205/0216 (US);
A61M2205/332 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | ADAPTIONSEINRICHTUNG ZUR ANKOPPLUNG MINDESTENS EINES SENSORS AN EINE SCHLAUCHMANTELWAND EINES SCHLAUCHS ZUR FLUIDVERMESSUNG SOWIE SENSORVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER DERARTIGEN ADAPTIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2024/13] | English: | ADAPTATION DEVICE FOR COUPLING AT LEAST ONE SENSOR TO A TUBE SLEEVE WALL OF A TUBE FOR FLUID MEASUREMENT, AND SENSOR DEVICE HAVING AN ADAPTATION DEVICE OF THIS TYPE | [2024/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADAPTATION POUR COUPLER AU MOINS UN CAPTEUR À UNE PAROI D'ENVELOPPE DE FLEXIBLE D'UN FLEXIBLE DE MESURE DE FLUIDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DOTÉ D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF D'ADAPTATION | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 07.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE202006016225U (ENDRESS & HAUSER GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [IA]WO2015172890 (NOVALUNG GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE102008030802 | EP3142724 | DE202020106224U |