EP4341482 - RECYCLABLE ARTIFICIAL TURF AND HDPE BACKING LAYER FOR RECYCLABLE ARTIFICIAL TURF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ten Cate Thiolon B.V. G. van der Muelenweg 2 7443 RE Nijverdal / NL | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Colin 7443 RE Nijverdal / NL | 02 /
SETHUNATH, Salil 7443 RE Nijverdal / NL | 03 /
HEERINK, Hein Anton 7443 RE Nijverdal / NL | 04 /
VOGEL, Michael Rene 7443 RE Nijverdal / NL | 05 /
KOLKMAN, Niels Gerhardus 7443 RE Nijverdal / NL | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22730423.5 | 20.05.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022EP63809 | Priority number, date | NL20212028272 | 21.05.2021 Original published format: NL 2028272 | [2024/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022243551 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4341482 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D06N7/00, B29C55/06, C08L23/04, D01D5/253, D01D5/42, D01F6/46, D05C17/02, E01C13/08 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
D06N7/0068 (EP,US);
D03D15/283 (KR,US);
B29C55/06 (EP);
C08L23/06 (US);
D01D5/253 (EP,US);
D01D5/426 (EP,US);
D01F1/10 (EP);
D01F6/04 (EP,US);
D01F6/30 (EP);
D02G3/445 (KR);
D03D1/00 (US);
D03D13/008 (US);
D03D15/46 (KR,US);
D03D15/573 (US);
D03D15/587 (US);
D05C17/023 (EP,KR,US);
D06N7/0065 (US);
D06N7/0078 (US);
D06N7/0081 (EP);
E01C13/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2207/062 (EP,US);
D06N2201/0254 (EP,US);
D06N2201/12 (EP);
D06N2203/042 (EP,US);
D06N2213/02 (EP);
D06N2213/06 (EP);
D06N2213/061 (EP);
D06N2213/065 (EP);
D10B2321/021 (KR);
D10B2321/0211 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | RECYCELBARER KUNSTRASEN UND HDPE-RÜCKSEITENSCHICHT FÜR RECYCELBAREN KUNSTRASEN | [2024/13] | English: | RECYCLABLE ARTIFICIAL TURF AND HDPE BACKING LAYER FOR RECYCLABLE ARTIFICIAL TURF | [2024/13] | French: | GAZON ARTIFICIEL RECYCLABLE ET COUCHE DE SUPPORT HDPE POUR GAZON ARTIFICIEL RECYCLABLE | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2023 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 01.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2004195666 ; | [XI]JP2001162738 ; | [XYI]JP2004143637 ; | [XYI]EP3635040 (TOTAL RES & TECHNOLOGY FELUY [BE]); | by applicant | US6897170 |