EP4320348 - WIND TURBINE POWER PLANT INCLUDING AUXILIARY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAWKINS, Samuel 7100 Vejle / DK | 02 /
JENSEN, Dennis Stachniuk 7330 Brande / DK | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/07] | SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22730918.4 | 31.05.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022EP64775 | Priority number, date | EP20210181506 | 24.06.2021 Original published format: EP 21181506 | [2024/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022268454 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4320348 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02, F03D9/10, F03D9/11, F03D9/28 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
F03D7/0284 (EP);
F03D80/003 (EP);
F03D9/10 (EP);
F03D9/11 (EP);
F03D9/28 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E70/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDTURBINENKRAFTWERK MIT ZUSATZSYSTEMEN | [2024/11] | English: | WIND TURBINE POWER PLANT INCLUDING AUXILIARY SYSTEMS | [2024/07] | French: | CENTRALE ÉOLIENNE COMPRENANT DES SYSTÈMES AUXILIAIRES | [2024/07] |
Former [2024/07] | WINDTURBINENKRAFTWERK MIT HILFSSYSTEMEN | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2023 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 07.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004059814 (HAWAIIAN ELECTRIC COMPANY INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 36 - page 11, line 19 * * figure - *; | [X]EP1903213 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] - [0064] * * figure - *; | [X]EP2282055 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0018] - [0046] * * figure - *; | [X]WO2011019321 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 8, line 21 - page 18, line 15 * * figure - *; | [A]EP2479429 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** figure - *; | [X]US2020166017 (HANSEN TORBEN MØLLER [DK], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0067] - [0094] * * figure - * | by applicant | WO2004059814 | EP1903213 | EP2282055 | WO2011019321 | US2020166017 |