EP4381912 - TILT AND ROTATE DISPENSER HAVING MATERIAL FLOW RATE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview IL 60025 / US | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORGET, Ronald, J. Douglas, MA 01516 / US | 02 /
KARLINSKI, Thomas, J. Atkinson, NH 03811 / US | 03 /
REID, Scott, A. Bradford, MA 01835 / US | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 22731423.4 | 25.05.2022 | [2024/24] | WO2022US30908 | Priority number, date | US202117393003 | 03.08.2021 Original published format: US202117393003 | [2024/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023014424 | Date: | 09.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4381912 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/04 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H05K13/0469 (EP,KR);
B05B13/0415 (US);
B05C5/02 (US);
B05C5/0216 (US);
H01L21/6715 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KIPP- UND DREHSPENDER MIT MATERIALDURCHFLUSSRATENSTEUERUNG | [2024/24] | English: | TILT AND ROTATE DISPENSER HAVING MATERIAL FLOW RATE CONTROL | [2024/24] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR D'INCLINAISON ET DE ROTATION AYANT UNE COMMANDE DE DÉBIT DE MATÉRIAU | [2024/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 13.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009317554 (CHRISTENSEN DENNIS R [US], et al); | [XI]US2016158786 (CHRISTENSEN DENNIS RONN [US]); | [L]WO2021211239 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) |