EP4347748 - RISER SEPARATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T.EN PROCESS TECHNOLOGY, INC. 11720 Katy Freeway Houston, TX 77079 / US | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCHANT, Paul Houston, TX 77079 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Raj, Kanwar Houston, TX 77079 / US | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | McWilliams, David John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/15] | Withers & Rogers Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 22731424.2 | 25.05.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022US30915 | Priority number, date | US202117330354 | 25.05.2021 Original published format: US202117330354 | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022251354 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4347748 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18, B01D45/06, B01D45/08, B01J8/18 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP,KR);
B01J8/24 (US);
B01D45/02 (EP,KR);
B01D45/06 (EP,KR);
B01D45/08 (KR,US);
B01J4/001 (US);
B01J8/388 (EP,KR);
B01D45/16 (US);
B01J2208/00761 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | STEIGROHRTRENNSYSTEME | [2024/15] | English: | RISER SEPARATION SYSTEMS | [2024/15] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE SÉPARATION DE COLONNES MONTANTES | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 04.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2767715 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [Y]US2010175553 (ANDREUX REGIS [FR], et al); | [XDY]US10731086 (MARCHANT PAUL [US], et al); | [XP]WO2021115794 (IFP ENERGIES NOW [FR]) | by applicant | US4664888 | US6296812 | US10731086 |