EP4106105 - ELECTRONIC COMPONENT CONNECTION STRUCTURE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Jiuliang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 22731460.6 | 10.02.2022 | [2022/51] | WO2022CN75892 | Priority number, date | CN202120944650U | 30.04.2021 Original published format: CN 202120944650 U | [2022/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022227785 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4106105 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4106105 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.11.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/52, H04B1/3816 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (US);
H01Q1/52 (EP,US);
H04B1/3816 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/52 | ||
Former IPC [2022/51] | H01Q1/38, H05K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE KOMPONENTEN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/51] | English: | ELECTRONIC COMPONENT CONNECTION STRUCTURE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/51] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CONNEXION DE COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2022 | Translation filed | 28.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 30.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4682180 (GANS MICHAEL J [US]); | [XI]WO2020082361 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [XI]US2020335850 (OH SANGGI [KR], et al); | International search | [A]CN2565233Y (HONGDA INTERNAT ELECTRONICS CO [CN]); | [A]US2005017902 (OYAMA RYUJI [JP], et al); | [X]TW200605770 (E TEN INFORMATION SYS CO LTD [TW]); | [A]CN201830551U (ZTE CORP); | [X]CN107948355 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD); | [A]CN208460973U (MERRYTEK INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) |