EP4370322 - ROLL ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Straße 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPOS SOUZA, José Luiz 89518 Heidenheim / DE | 02 /
MARUSA, Dominik 89075 Ulm / DE | 03 /
MARTIN, Thomas 89129 Langenau / DE | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Voith Patent GmbH - Patentabteilung St. Pöltener Straße 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22732569.3 | 13.06.2022 | [2024/21] | WO2022EP65998 | Priority number, date | DE202110118165 | 14.07.2021 Original published format: DE102021118165 | [2024/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023285049 | Date: | 19.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4370322 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/12, D21F11/00 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
D21F11/00 (EP);
D21F3/08 (US);
B31F1/128 (EP);
D21F3/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WALZENANORDNUNG | [2024/21] | English: | ROLL ARRANGEMENT | [2024/21] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE ROULEAUX | [2024/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | 14.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1255619 (WEST VIRGINIA PULP & PAPER CO, et al) [X] 1,10,11,14,15,19 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 9; figure - *; | [XA]US4051215 (TSURUTA MOTOHIRO, et al) [X] 1,10,11,14,15,19 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 32; figure - * [A] 2-9,12,13,17,18; | [X]DE2729949 (CLUPAK INC) [X] 1,10,11,14,15,19 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]EP0663363 (KOREN ERWIN [AT]) [A] 16* figure -; claim 1 * |