EP4355747 - (R)-N-ETHYL-5-FLUORO-N-ISOPROPYL-2-((5-(2-(6-((2-METHOXYETHYL)(METHYL)AMINO)-2-METHYLHEXAN-3-YL)-2,6-DIAZASPIRO[3.4]OCTAN-6-YL)-1,2,4-TRIAZIN-6-YL)OXY)BENZAMIDE BESYLATE SALT FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES SUCH AS CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JANSSEN Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAI, Wei Shanghai 200233 / CN | 02 /
DAI, Xuedong Shanghai 200233 / CN | 03 /
QUEROLLE, Olivier Alexis Georges 92787 Issy-les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR | 04 /
THURING, Johannes Wilhelmus J. 2340 Beerse / BE | 05 /
NG, Alicia Tee Fuay Shanghai 200233 / CN | 06 /
DARVILLE, Nicolas Freddy Jacques Bruno 2340 Beerse / BE | 07 /
GEERTMAN, Robert Michael 2340 Beerse / BE | 08 /
AHUJA, Dipali 2340 Beerse / BE | 09 /
LIU, Yingtao Shanghai 200233 / CN | 10 /
PANDE, Vineet 2340 Beerse / BE | 11 /
CLEATOR, Edward High Wycombe, HP12 4EG / GB | 12 /
BEN HAIM, Cyril 2340 Beerse / BE | 13 /
SMOLDERS, Simon Jan C 2340 Beerse / BE | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Lenaerts, Philip Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22733288.9 | 16.06.2022 | [2024/17] | WO2022CN99089 | Priority number, date | WO2021CN100466 | 17.06.2021 Original published format: PCT/CN2021/100466 | WO2022CN91677 | 09.05.2022 Original published format: PCT/CN2022/091677 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022262796 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4355747 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61P35/00, A61K31/53, C07C1/00, C07D487/10 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
C07D487/10 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/53 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/02 (KR);
C07C231/02 (EP,IL,KR);
C07C235/46 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C231/02, C07C235/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | 17.01.2024 | ME | 17.01.2024 | Validation states | KH | 17.01.2024 | MA | 17.01.2024 | MD | 17.01.2024 | TN | 17.01.2024 | Title | German: | (R)-N-ETHYL-5-FLUOR-N-ISOPROPYL-2-(5-(2-((2-METHOXYETHYL)(METHYL)AMINO)-2-METHYLHEXAN-3-YL)-2,6-DIAZASPIRO[3.4 OCTAN-6-YL)1,2,4-TRIAZIN-6-YL)OXY)BENZAMID-BESYLATSALZ | [2024/17] | English: | (R)-N-ETHYL-5-FLUORO-N-ISOPROPYL-2-((5-(2-(6-((2-METHOXYETHYL)(METHYL)AMINO)-2-METHYLHEXAN-3-YL)-2,6-DIAZASPIRO[3.4]OCTAN-6-YL)-1,2,4-TRIAZIN-6-YL)OXY)BENZAMIDE BESYLATE SALT FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES SUCH AS CANCER | [2024/17] | French: | SEL DE BÉSYLATE (R)-N-ÉTHYL-5-FLUORO-N-ISOPROPYL-2-((5-(2-(6-((2-MÉTHOXYÉTHYL)(MÉTHYL)AMINO)-2-M ÉTHYLHEXAN-3-YL)-2,6-DIAZASPIRO[3.4]OCTAN-6-YL)-1,2,4-TRIAZIN-6-YL)OXY)BENZAMIDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES TELLES QUE LE CANCER | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 17.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP3394064 (VITAE PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | [IDA]EP3468966 (VITAE PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | [XP]WO2021121327 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) | by applicant | WO2011029054 | WO2014164543 | WO2016040330 | WO2016195776 | WO2016197027 | WO2017112768 | WO2017132398 | WO2017161002 | WO2017161028 | WO2017192543 | WO2017207387 | WO2017214367 | WO2018024602 | WO2018053267 | WO2018050686 | WO2018050684 | WO2018106818 | WO2018106820 | WO2018109088 | WO2018153312 | WO2018175746 | WO2018226976 | WO2019060365 | WO2020069027 |