EP4351582 - COMBINATION OF A PARTICULAR BRAF INHIBITOR (PARADOX BREAKER) AND A PD-1 AXIS BINDING ANTAGONIST FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKMANN, Jan 82377 Penzberg / DE | 02 /
FRIESS, Thomas 82377 Penzberg / DE | 03 /
HERTING, Frank 82377 Penzberg / DE | 04 /
PETTAZZONI, Piergiorgio Francesco Tommaso 4070 Basel / CH | 05 /
WICHMANN, Juergen 4070 Basel / CH | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Vitra, Hermeto F. Hoffman-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2024/16] | Salud, Carlos E. F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 22733341.6 | 07.06.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022EP65373 | Priority number, date | EP20210178462 | 09.06.2021 Original published format: EP 21178462 | EP20220157499 | 18.02.2022 Original published format: EP 22157499 | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022258600 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4351582 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/517, A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61P35/00 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/517 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4523 (US);
A61K39/395 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | KOMBINATION EINES BESTIMMTEN BRAF-HEMMERS (PARADOXBRECHER) UND EINES PD-1-ACHSENBINDENDEN ANTAGONISTEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2024/16] | English: | COMBINATION OF A PARTICULAR BRAF INHIBITOR (PARADOX BREAKER) AND A PD-1 AXIS BINDING ANTAGONIST FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2024/16] | French: | ASSOCIATION D'UN INHIBITEUR DE BRAF PARTICULIER ("PARADOX BREAKER") ET D'UN ANTAGONISTE DE LIAISON À L'AXE PD-1 POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 09.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018075447 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]); | [AP]WO2021116055 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) | by applicant | WO8403506 | WO8403564 | US4676980 | US4708871 | US4816567 | US4833092 | EP0404097 | WO9301161 | WO9308829 | US5223409 | WO9316185 | US5403484 | US5556762 | US5565332 | US5571689 | US5571894 | US5587458 | WO9730087 | US5663143 | US5731168 | US5750373 | US5770429 | US5821337 | WO9858964 | US5869046 | WO9922764 | US5959177 | US6040498 | US6054297 | US6075181 | WO0061739 | US6150584 | US6171586 | WO0107611 | WO0129246 | US6248516 | US6267958 | WO0231140 | US6417429 | US6420548 | US2002164328 | WO03011878 | US2003115614 | US6602684 | US2003157108 | WO03085119 | WO03084570 | WO03085107 | US2004093621 | US2004110704 | US2004110282 | US2004109865 | US2004132140 | WO2004056312 | US2004132066 | WO2004065540 | US2005079574 | WO2005035586 | WO2005035778 | US2005119455 | US2005123546 | WO2005053742 | US2005260186 | US2005266000 | US6982321 | US2006025576 | WO2006044908 | US7041870 | US7087409 | US7125978 | US7189826 | US2007061900 | US2007117126 | US2007160598 | US2007237764 | US2007292936 | US2008069820 | WO2008077546 | US2009002360 | US7521541 | US7527791 | WO2009089004 | EP2101823 | WO2012118492 | WO2015107493 | WO2015107494 | WO2015107495 | WO2019075265 |