EP4364107 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING THE DETECTION OF THE SURROUNDINGS OF A VEHICLE TRAVELING IN AN AUTOMATED MANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILIPP, Robin 38179 Schwülper / DE | 02 /
REHBEIN, Jana 38106 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
HARTJEN, Lukas 38106 Braunschweig / DE | 04 /
BUSSLER, Andreas 38440 Wolfsbrug / DE | 05 /
SCHULDT, Fabian 38536 Meinersen / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22735133.5 | 16.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022EP66490 | Priority number, date | DE202110206983 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: DE102021206983 | [2024/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023274746 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4364107 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/56, G05D1/00 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G06V20/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM UNTERSTÜTZEN EINER UMFELDERKENNUNG FÜR EIN AUTOMATISIERT FAHRENDES FAHRZEUG | [2024/19] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING THE DETECTION OF THE SURROUNDINGS OF A VEHICLE TRAVELING IN AN AUTOMATED MANNER | [2024/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'AIDE À LA DÉTECTION DE L'ENVIRONNEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE SE DÉPLAÇANT DE MANIÈRE AUTOMATISÉE | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 02.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]US2017115387 (LUDERS BRANDON DOUGLAS [US], et al) [I] 1,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0104] , [ 125] - [0126] *[A] 2-8; | [I]US2018075309 (SATHYANARAYANA SUCHITRA [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 5,6,8 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 24] , [0 28] , [0 31] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0059] * * paragraphs [0067] , [0 83] , [0 93] , [ 101] * | by applicant | US2019374151 | US2020130682 |