EP4359044 - AUTOINJECTOR WITH SECURITY FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson France rue Aristide Bergès 38800 Le Pont-de-Claix / FR | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIARD, Michael 38320 Eybens / FR | 02 /
JAMON, Rémi 38410 VAULNAVEYS LE HAUT / FR | 03 /
PETIT, Louis 38610 Venon / FR | 04 /
DUCAROUGE, Pierre 38100 Grenoble / FR | 05 /
MURIER, Arnaud 38100 Grenoble / FR | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22735404.0 | 21.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022EP66912 | Priority number, date | EP20210305881 | 25.06.2021 Original published format: EP 21305881 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022268831 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4359044 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M5/32, A61M5/20, A61M5/50, A61M5/24 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A61M5/2422 (EP);
A61M5/2033 (EP);
A61M5/31501 (EP);
A61M5/31571 (EP);
A61M5/3158 (EP);
A61M5/31591 (EP);
A61M5/3202 (EP);
A61M5/50 (EP);
A61M2005/2013 (EP);
A61M2005/208 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOINJEKTOR MIT SICHERHEITSFUNKTION | [2024/18] | English: | AUTOINJECTOR WITH SECURITY FEATURE | [2024/18] | French: | AUTO-INJECTEUR AYANT UNE CARACTÉRISTIQUE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 23.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014037805 (BECTON DICKINSON FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2015169608 (CAREBAY EUROPE LTD [MT]) [Y] 1 * pages 4-5 *; | [IY]WO2019011688 (SHL MEDICAL AG [CH]) [I] 1 * pages 6-13; figures 1-10 * [Y] 1; | [A]US2019030248 (HANSEN SOEREN KJELLERUP [DK]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US10357617 (HOLMQVIST ANDERS [SE]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2020036717 (ANTARES PHARMA INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2021045932 (AMGEN INC [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2019011688 |