EP4359256 - CONTAINER LOCKING DEVICE AND CONTAINER LOCKING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamburger Patent Schmiede GmbH Müllerstraße 10 21244 Buchholz / DE | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
METTERNICH, Heinz-Rüdiger 21279 Eversen-Heide / DE | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Jochen Patentanwaltskanzlei Hansen Eisenbahnstraße 5 21680 Stade / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22735767.0 | 14.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022DE100442 | Priority number, date | DE202110116280 | 23.06.2021 Original published format: DE102021116280 | DE202110122625 | 01.09.2021 Original published format: DE102021122625 | [2024/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022268257 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4359256 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/13 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
B60P7/132 (EP,KR);
B60Y2200/147 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CONTAINERVERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE CONTAINERVERRIEGELUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/18] | English: | CONTAINER LOCKING DEVICE AND CONTAINER LOCKING METHOD | [2024/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE DE CONTENEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE VERROUILLAGE DE CONTENEUR | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 29.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |