EP4359435 - COMBINATION DOSAGE REGIME OF CD137 AND PD-L1 BINDING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genmab A/S Kalvebod Brygge 43 1560 Copenhagen V / DK | For all designated states BioNTech SE An der Goldgrube 12 55131 Mainz / DE | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAHIN, Ugur 55116 Mainz / DE | 02 /
MUIK, Alexander 55131 Mainz / DE | 03 /
FORSSMANN, Ulf 1560 Copenhagen / DK | 04 /
JURE-KUNKEL, Maria N. Plains / US | 05 /
BAJAJ, Gaurav Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | 06 /
TALHAUSER, Craig Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | 07 /
PENCHEVA, Nora 3584 Utrecht / NL | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22735846.2 | 20.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022EP66764 | Priority number, date | US202163212781P | 21.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163212781 P | US202163257879P | 20.10.2021 Original published format: US 202163257879 P | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022268740 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4359435 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/24, C07K16/28, A61K39/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
C07K16/24 (EP,IL);
C07K16/2878 (US);
A61P35/00 (US);
C07K16/2827 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | 22.01.2024 | ME | 22.01.2024 | Validation states | KH | 22.01.2024 | MA | 22.01.2024 | MD | 22.01.2024 | TN | 22.01.2024 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSDOSIERUNGSSCHEMA VON CD137- UND PD-L1-BINDENDEN WIRKSTOFFEN | [2024/18] | English: | COMBINATION DOSAGE REGIME OF CD137 AND PD-L1 BINDING AGENTS | [2024/18] | French: | RÉGIME POSOLOGIQUE COMBINÉ D'AGENTS DE LIAISON CD137 ET PD-L1 | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 22.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDY]WO2019025545 (GENMAB AS [DK], et al); | by applicant | US201000155133 | WO20100226923 | WO9222653 | EP0629240 | WO9850431 | WO03074569 | WO2005004809 | WO2005035584 | WO2005061547 | WO2007059782 | US7262028 | WO2007110205 | EP1870459 | WO2008003116 | WO2008157379 | WO2009040562 | WO2009058383 | WO2009080254 | WO2009089004 | US7612181 | WO2010015792 | WO2010059315 | WO2010080538 | WO2010111625 | WO2010129304 | WO2010134666 | WO2011028952 | US7951918 | WO2011069104 | WO2011117329 | WO2011131746 | WO2011143545 | CN102250246 | WO2012023053 | WO2012025525 | WO2012025530 | WO2012058768 | WO2013060867 | WO2013157953 | WO2014081202 | WO2015150327 | WO2016110584 | WO2019025545 |