EP4346479 - REMOVEABLE HELMET COVER AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Game Day Skinz Inc. 4646 McKinney Ave. 503 Dallas, Texas 75205 / US | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRESTON, Conner Alan Dallas, Texas 75205 / US | 02 /
RIGBI, Barak Poway, California 92064 / US | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22736112.8 | 25.05.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022US72549 | Priority number, date | US202163192927P | 25.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163192927 P | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022251839 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4346479 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/00, A42C2/00, B29C45/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
A42C2/007 (US);
A42B3/003 (EP,US);
A42C2/00 (EP);
A42C2/002 (EP);
B29C33/3842 (EP);
B29C45/00 (US);
B29C45/26 (EP);
B29C45/372 (EP);
B29C64/386 (US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
B33Y50/00 (US);
B29C2045/0058 (EP);
B29K2021/003 (EP);
B29K2075/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | ENTFERNBARE HELMABDECKUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/15] | English: | REMOVEABLE HELMET COVER AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE | [2024/15] | French: | COUVRE-CASQUE AMOVIBLE ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 21.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US4599752 (MITCHELL STEVEN C [US]); | [XI]US4937888 (STRAUS ALBERT E [US]); | [XAI]US2007107112 (BOYD JANICE [US]); | [Y]US2010247868 (CHA YOON JONG [KR], et al); | [XI]US2013340149 (RICHWINE CRAIG A [US]) |