EP4367982 - DEVICE WITH CONNECTION ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAYER, Ralph 76698 Ubstadt-Weiher / DE | 02 /
BENNERSCHEIDT, Ralf 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
ZERR, Rodion 76646 Bruchsal / DE | 04 /
HOFMANN, Christian 76669 Bad Schönborn / DE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22736167.2 | 13.06.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022EP66049 | Priority number, date | DE20211003501 | 07.07.2021 Original published format: DE102021003501 | [2024/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023280526 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4367982 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
H05K7/14327 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT MIT VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG | [2024/20] | English: | DEVICE WITH CONNECTION ARRANGEMENT | [2024/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME DE CONNEXION | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US5982253 (PERRIN RANDALL L [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * figures 1-9 * * column 8, line 16 - column 9, line 30 * [A] 2,7-11[I] 12-15 | by applicant | EP0735646 | US6104110 | EP1466402 |