EP4275034 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING ISOTROPIC IN-PLANE SUPER-RESOLUTION IMAGES FROM LINE-SCANNING CONFOCAL MICROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The United States of America, as represented by The Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services 6011 Executive Boulevard Suite 325, MSC 7660 Bethesda, Maryland 20892-7660 / US | For all designated states The University of Chicago 5801 South Ellis Avenue Chicago Illinois 60637 / US | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHROFF, Hari Bethesda, Maryland 20892 / US | 02 /
WU, Yicong Bethesda, Maryland 20892 / US | 03 /
HAN, Xiaofei Bethesda, Maryland 20892 / US | 04 /
LA RIVIERE, Patrick Chicago, Illinois 60637 / US | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22737121.8 | 06.01.2022 | [2023/46] | WO2022US11484 | Priority number, date | US202163134907P | 07.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163134907 P | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022150506 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4275034 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N21/47, G06N3/04, G01N21/17 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06T3/4053 (US);
G02B21/0036 (EP);
G02B21/0072 (EP);
G02B21/367 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP);
G06T3/4046 (US);
G06T5/50 (US);
G01N21/6458 (EP);
G01N2201/1296 (EP);
G02B21/0076 (EP);
G02B27/58 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ISOTROPER SUPERAUFLÖSENDER BILDER AUF GLEICHER EBENE AUS KONFOKALER LINIENABTASTMIKROSKOPIE | [2023/46] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING ISOTROPIC IN-PLANE SUPER-RESOLUTION IMAGES FROM LINE-SCANNING CONFOCAL MICROSCOPY | [2023/46] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION D'IMAGES À SUPER-RÉSOLUTION DANS LE PLAN ISOTROPES À PARTIR D'UNE MICROSCOPIE CONFOCALE À BALAYAGE LINÉAIRE | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2019333199 (OZCAN AYDOGAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0008]-[0014], [0071] * [A] 5-11; | [Y]US2020211209 (LIAO SHU [CN], et al) [Y] 2-4 * paragraphs [0069], [0155], [0171] *; | [A]WO2020139835 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0005]-[0011] *; | [Y]US2020250794 (ZIMMER CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0040] and claim 11 *; | [A] - Kose Kivanc, Bozkurt Alican, Alessi-Fox Christi, Brooks Dana H., Dy Jennifer G., Rajadhyaksha Milind, Gill Melissa, "Utilizing Machine Learning for Image Quality Assessment for Reflectance Confocal Microscopy", Journal of Investigative Dermatology, NL , (20200601), vol. 140, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.jid.2019.10.018, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 1214 - 1222, XP055949801 [A] 1-11 * page 1214 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jid.2019.10.018 |