EP4280753 - TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Yu Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Siqi Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | 03 /
JI, Zichao Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Huan Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22739001.0 | 11.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022CN71324 | Priority number, date | CN20211057838 | 15.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110057838 | [2023/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022152122 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4280753 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/28, H04W52/02, H04W72/12, // H04W72/40, H04W4/40, H04W92/18 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H04W52/0245 (EP);
H04W52/0216 (KR);
H04W4/70 (CN);
H04W72/02 (CN,US);
H04L1/1812 (KR,US);
H04W24/08 (KR);
H04W52/0248 (EP,CN);
H04W72/1215 (EP);
H04W72/25 (KR,US);
H04W72/542 (KR);
H04W72/563 (KR);
H04W76/14 (CN);
H04W76/28 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W92/18 (EP,KR);
H04W4/40 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/47] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSKONFIGURATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE ENDGERÄT | [2023/47] | English: | TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND TERMINAL | [2023/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONFIGURATION DE TRANSMISSION, ET TERMINAL | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2023 | Translation filed | 28.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 19.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2020057489 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY [CN]); |