EP4351462 - ACTIVE ALIGNMENT SYSTEM FOR LASER OPTICAL COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bolt Medical, Inc. 5993 Avenida Encinas, Suite 100 Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOK, Christopher, A. Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP, et al Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/16] | Sayer, Kathryn Isis Ariel, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 22740592.5 | 03.06.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022US32045 | Priority number, date | US202163197959P | 07.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163197959 P | US202217831056 | 02.06.2022 Original published format: US202217831056 | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022260932 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4351462 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/24 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
A61B18/26 (EP);
A61B18/22 (US);
A61B18/24 (EP);
A61M25/0105 (US);
A61B18/245 (EP);
A61B2017/00057 (EP);
A61B2018/00107 (US);
A61B2018/00154 (EP);
A61B2018/00166 (EP);
A61B2018/0022 (EP);
A61B2018/00232 (EP);
A61B2018/00285 (EP);
A61B2018/00369 (EP);
A61B2018/00577 (EP);
A61B2018/00642 (EP);
A61B2018/00785 (EP);
A61B2018/2025 (EP);
A61B2018/20359 (EP);
A61B2018/205547 (EP,US);
A61B2018/2211 (EP);
A61B2018/2247 (EP);
A61B2018/2261 (EP,US);
A61B2018/2266 (EP);
A61B2018/2272 (EP);
A61B2018/263 (EP);
A61B2018/266 (EP);
A61B90/361 (EP);
A61M2025/0166 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVES AUSRICHTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR OPTISCHE LASERKOPPLUNG | [2024/16] | English: | ACTIVE ALIGNMENT SYSTEM FOR LASER OPTICAL COUPLING | [2024/16] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIGNEMENT ACTIF POUR COUPLAGE OPTIQUE LASER | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 15.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5034010 (KITTRELL CARTER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,14-18,26,28,58 * column 17, line 13 - column 21, line 35; figures 19,20,21; claims 6,9,13,14,23 * [I] 20; | [X]US2014276689 (GRACE KENNETH P [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,17,26,27,58 * paragraphs [0033] , [0062] - [0069] - [0075]; figures 4,8; claim 7 *; | [XP]WO2021231178 (BOLT MEDICAL INC [US]) [XP] 1,2,4-8,14-18,26-28,58* figure 2; claims 1,2,19-24,26,28,31,37 * |