EP4222617 - WEB SCRAPING THROUGH USE OF PROXIES, AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states oxylabs, UAB Svitrigailos g. 32 03230 Vilnius / LT | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILCINSKAS, Eivydas 78358 Siauliai City / LT | 02 /
PETRUSKEVICIUS, Arnas 08221 Vilnius / LT | 03 /
STALIORAITIS, Giedrius 02198 Vilnius / LT | 04 /
JURAVICIUS, Martynas 03203 Vilnius / LT | 05 /
STANKEVICIUS, Rimantas 08310 Vilnius / LT | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/32] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22740786.3 | 24.06.2022 | [2023/32] | WO2022EP67331 | Priority number, date | US202163219660P | 08.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163219660 P | US202117373287 | 12.07.2021 Original published format: US202117373287 | US202117373312 | 12.07.2021 Original published format: US202117373312 | US202117373482 | 12.07.2021 Original published format: US202117373482 | US202117373570 | 12.07.2021 Original published format: US202117373570 | US202117373608 | 12.07.2021 Original published format: US202117373608 | US202117373634 | 12.07.2021 Original published format: US202117373634 | [2023/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023280593 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4222617 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/958, G06F16/951 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
G06F16/972 (EP,IL);
G06F16/951 (EP,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | BAHNABKRATZEN DURCH VERWENDUNG VON PROXIES UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2023/32] | English: | WEB SCRAPING THROUGH USE OF PROXIES, AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF | [2023/32] | French: | MOISSONNAGE DU WEB AU MOYEN DE SERVEURS MANDATAIRES, ET APPLICATIONS CORRESPONDANTES | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 02.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Divisional application(s) | EP23171587.1 / EP4227828 | EP23171700.0 / EP4227829 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2007050338 (STROHM ALAN C [US], et al) [X] 121,140 * the whole document * [A] 1-120[I] 122-139; | [XAI]US2012324113 (PRINCE MATTHEW BROWNING [US], et al) [X] 61,72,78,79,81-85,87-95,97-100 * the whole document * [A] 1-60,101-140 [I] 62-71,73-78,80,86,96; | [A]US2014122682 (FALKENBERG MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-140 * the whole document *; | [XAI]WO2019174613 (BEIJING DIDI INFINITY TECHNOLOGY & DEV CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,7-9,12-14,18,20 * the whole document * [A] 21-140 [I] 3-6,10,11,15-17,19; | [XAI]US2020117757 (YANAMANDRA SANGEETHA [IN], et al) [X] 41,49,57 * the whole document * [A] 1-40,61-140 [I] 42-48,50-56,58-60; | [A]US10965770 (VILCINSKAS EIVYDAS [LT], et al) [A] 1-140 * the whole document *; | [XAI]WO2021064480 (METACLUSTER LT UAB [LT]) [X] 21,23,25-27,34-36 * the whole document * [A] 1-20,41-140 [I] 22,24,27-40; | [XAI] - X B Bai ET AL, "D3.4: Distributed Searching in Future Internet", Information and Communication Technologies (ICT) Programme Project No: FP7-‐ICT-‐ 248036 COAST, (20120615), pages 1 - 74, URL: http://www.coast-fp7.eu/public/COAST_D3.4_YAHOO_BM_FF.pdf, (20141210), XP055157749 [X] 101,108,115 * the whole document * [A] 1-100,121-140 [I] 102-107,109-114,116-120 |