EP4373722 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A SYSTEM FOR REGULATING THE SPEED OF A VEHICLE ADAPTIVELY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stellantis Auto SAS 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HECKETSWEILER, Thierry 90800 BAVILLIERS / FR | 02 /
COHEN, Christel 92160 ANTONY / FR | 03 /
MANCEUR, Malik 95870 BEZONS / FR | 04 /
IDLIMAM, Younes 78450 VILLEPREUX / FR | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22740946.3 | 17.06.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022FR51184 | Priority number, date | FR20210007811 | 20.07.2021 Original published format: FR 2107811 | [2024/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023002099 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4373722 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/16, B60W30/18, B60W60/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B60W30/16 (EP);
B60W30/18163 (EP);
B60W60/0013 (EP);
B60W60/0015 (EP);
B60W60/00274 (EP);
B60W2420/403 (EP);
B60W2554/4045 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ADAPTIVEN REGELUNG EINER FAHRZEUGGESCHWINDIGKEIT | [2024/22] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A SYSTEM FOR REGULATING THE SPEED OF A VEHICLE ADAPTIVELY | [2024/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉGULATION ADAPTATIVE DE VITESSE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 19.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2017240176 (AOKI KENICHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,5-10 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0043] * * figures 2, 20-22 * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0150] *; | [XA]DE102017112300 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS LLC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-10 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] * * claims 6-7 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4; | [I]WO2020099558 (JAGUAR LAND ROVER LTD [GB]) [I] 1,2,8-10 * page 1, lines 28-32 * * page 10, lines 36-40 * * page 11, lines 38-48 ** page 17, lines 15-16 * | by applicant | FR2107811 |