EP4282742 - FOLDING JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Meidahang Technology Co., Ltd. 8th FLoor, Art Exhibition Business Building, No.8 Art Exhibition 4th Road, Shapu Community Songgang Street, Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518100 / CN | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MO, Yiping Shenzhen, Guangdong 518100 / CN | 02 /
HON, David Tak Wei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518100 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Guoping Shenzhen, Guangdong 518100 / CN | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/48] | Wiseman, Robert George Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 22742083.3 | 14.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022CN71972 | Priority number, date | CN202120138265U | 19.01.2021 Original published format: CN 202120138265 U | [2023/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022156604 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4282742 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B62K15/00, F16C11/04, F16C11/10 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
B62K15/006 (EP,US);
F16B2/12 (EP);
F16B7/182 (EP);
F16C11/045 (EP);
F16C11/10 (EP);
F16B7/22 (EP);
F16C2326/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/48] | B62K15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | FALTGELENK | [2023/48] | English: | FOLDING JOINT | [2023/48] | French: | CHARNIÈRE PLIANTE | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2023 | Translation filed | 08.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 17.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5337609 (HSU SU-YUAN [TW]); | [A]JP2000085671 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [A]US2019256165 (BREWER BRIAN RAY [BR], et al); | [A]EP3584148 (DAHON TECH LTD [CN]) | International search | [A]JP2002037171 (KUSUKI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [X]CN2494788Y (HAN DEWEI [CN]); | [X]CN1406808 (HAN DEWEI [CN]); | [X]CN102806967 (OYAMA BICYCLE TAICANG CO LTD); | [A]CN212099205U (FUZHOU LEISIAO INFORMATION TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN214451577U (SHENZHEN MEIDAHANG TECH CO LTD) |