EP4255024 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING REDIRECTION FAILURE, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jieping Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 22742163.3 | 18.01.2022 | [2023/40] | WO2022CN72580 | Priority number, date | CN20211075875 | 20.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110075875 | [2023/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022156684 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4255024 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/08 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
H04W36/0079 (EP,US);
H04W28/08 (CN);
H04W36/0011 (CN);
H04W36/0055 (CN);
H04W36/06 (US);
H04W36/305 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON UMLEITUNGSFEHLERN, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/40] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING REDIRECTION FAILURE, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR TRAITER UNE DÉFAILLANCE DE REDIRECTION, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2023 | Translation filed | 28.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 16.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010113020 (SUBRAMANIAN RAMACHANDRAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2013019288 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [A]CN103327554 (ZTE CORP); | [XYI]CN107809775 (ZTE CORP) | International search | [A]US2013183981 (SINGH SUMIT KUMAR [US], et al); | [A]CN106034339 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN107809775 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN111698748 (SHANGHAI WENTAI INFORMATION TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN112888026 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD) |