EP4281474 - DUAL BINDING ANTIBODIES, METHODS OF PRODUCING DUAL BINDING ANTIBODIES, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biolojic Design Ltd. Hamada 12, Building B, 3rd Floor P.O. Box 4106 Rehovot 7670316 / IL | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMISHTEIN, Alik 4805638 Rosh Haayin / IL | 02 /
OMER, Dotan 4343314 Ra'anana / IL | 03 /
BERNSTEIN, Shmuel 7124901 Lod / IL | 04 /
LEVIN, Itay 4642758 Herzeliya / IL | 05 /
SASSON, Yehezkel 4486200 Tzur Yigal / IL | 06 /
STRAJBL, Marek 9330746 Jerusalem / IL | 07 /
FISCHMAN, Sharon 7176237 Modi'in / IL | 08 /
NIMROD, Guy 6226118 Tel Aviv / IL | 09 /
ZHENIN, Michael 9658603 Jerusalem / IL | 10 /
BARAK FUCHS, Reut 7608625 Rehovot / IL | 11 /
BLUVSHTEIN YERMOLAEV, Olga 7575120 Rishon-LeZion / IL | 12 /
FASTMAN, Yair 9655225 Jerusalem / IL | 13 /
TWITO, Oshrat Shir 7571807 Rishon LeTsiyon / IL | 14 /
OFRAN, Yanay 6215421 Tel Aviv / IL | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22742378.7 | 20.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022IL50087 | Priority number, date | US202163139815P | 21.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163139815 P | US202163195021P | 30.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163195021 P | US202263295905P | 02.01.2022 Original published format: US 202263295905 P | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022157773 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4281474 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, C12N15/09, C12Q1/68, C40B30/06, C40B30/10, C40B40/06 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
C07K16/244 (EP);
C07K16/2818 (EP,US);
C07K16/005 (EP);
C07K16/2875 (US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | DUAL-BINDENDE ANTIKÖRPER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DUAL-BINDENDEN ANTIKÖRPERN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2023/48] | English: | DUAL BINDING ANTIBODIES, METHODS OF PRODUCING DUAL BINDING ANTIBODIES, AND USES THEREOF | [2023/48] | French: | ANTICORPS À LIAISON DOUBLE, PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION D'ANTICORPS À LIAISON DOUBLE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009304693 (GHAYUR TARIQ [US], et al) [A] 22* ; entire document *; | [A]US2017342144 (WEI RONNIE [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * ; paragraph 0008, 0042, 0048, 0052 *; | [A]WO2017220988 (KYMAB LTD [GB]) [A] 1-22 * ; pg. 16, lines 30-32 *; | [A]WO2021001653 (OXFORD BIOTHERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-22 * ; p. 32, line 1, pg. 6, lines 27-28, pg. 7, lines 3-4 *; | [A] - FELLOUSE FREDERIC A ET AL, "High-throughput Generation of Synthetic Antibodies from Highly Functional Minimalist Phage-displayed Libraries.", Journal of Molecular Biology, Academic Press, United Kingdom, United Kingdom , (20071102), vol. 373, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.jmb.2007.08.005, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 924 - 940, XP002457179 [A] 1-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2007.08.005 |