EP4282932 - RESIN COMPOSITION, OPTICAL LAMINATE, OPTICAL ARTICLE, LENS, AND GLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOGUCHI, Takao Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Katsuhiro Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | 03 /
MOMODA, Junji Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/48] | Gerauer, Marc Philippé Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22742470.2 | 12.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022JP00699 | Priority number, date | JP20210009922 | 25.01.2021 Original published format: JP 2021009922 | JP20210047602 | 22.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021047602 | JP20210065523 | 07.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021065523 | [2023/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022158348 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4282932 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09K9/00, C09K9/02, G02C7/10, C08L75/04, C08L75/08, C08G18/48, C08G18/72, G02B1/00, G02B1/04, G02B5/23 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
G02C7/102 (EP);
C09K9/02 (EP,KR);
B32B27/06 (US);
B32B27/40 (US);
C08G18/242 (EP);
C08G18/3876 (EP);
C08G18/48 (KR);
C08G18/4854 (EP);
C08G18/6484 (EP);
C08G18/72 (KR);
C08G18/753 (EP);
C08G18/757 (EP);
C08L75/04 (KR);
C08L75/08 (EP,KR,US);
G02B1/00 (KR);
G02B1/04 (KR);
G02B1/041 (EP);
G02B5/23 (EP,KR);
G02C7/10 (KR);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2307/42 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/098, C08L75/08 (EP);
C09J175/08, C08K5/0041, C08K5/005, C08K3/08 (EP);
G02B1/041, C08K5/0041, C08L75/04 (EP);
C08K5/0041, C08L75/08 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, OPTISCHES LAMINAT, OPTISCHER ARTIKEL, LINSE UND GLÄSER | [2023/48] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION, OPTICAL LAMINATE, OPTICAL ARTICLE, LENS, AND GLASSES | [2023/48] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE, STRATIFIÉ OPTIQUE, ARTICLE OPTIQUE, LENTILLES ET LUNETTES | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2023 | Translation filed | 27.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2016143910 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004], lines 19-24, examples 1-29 *; | [A]WO2017038865 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0215]-[0268] *; | [A]WO2019198664 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009], [0197]-[0199] *; | [PA]WO2021241596 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-15 * paragraphs [0091], [0201], [0313]-[0348] * | by applicant | JPS522189B | JPS62288830 | JPH0228154 | WO9422850 | WO9614596 | JPH08157467 | JPH08176139 | JPH08295690 | JPH09124645 | US5645767 | JPH09218301 | US5658501 | US5961892 | JPH11279171 | JPH11286484 | JPH11322739 | WO0015630 | JP2000219678 | JP2000219686 | JP2000229976 | JP2000229975 | JP2000229974 | JP2000229973 | JP2000229972 | JP2000256347 | JP2000327675 | WO0071544 | JP2000344761 | JP2001011067 | JP2001011066 | JP2001031670 | WO0160811 | US6296785 | WO02090342 | WO03042203 | JP2003277381 | JP3471073B | WO2004041961 | WO2005028465 | JP2005112772 | JP2005289812 | JP2005289807 | JP3801386B | WO2007086532 | JP3982770B | WO2008023828 | JP2008074832 | JP4118458B | JP4158881B | JP4157245B | JP4157239B | JP4157227B | JP4195615B | JP2009057300 | JP2009067754 | JP2009067680 | JP4256985B | JP2009120536 | JP4301621B | WO2009136668 | JP4369754B | WO2009146509 | JP4424981B | JP4424962B | WO2012149599 | WO2012162725 | WO2012176439 | WO2013078086 | WO2015068798 | WO2015115648 | WO2016143910 | WO2019013249 | WO2019203205 |