EP4374026 - INVISIBLE ATTACHMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Woodesign 286 Chemin des Prés 06600 Antibes / FR | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSCHIAN, Louis 06410 Biot / FR | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/22] | 01 /
BOSCHIAN, Louis 06410 BIOT / FR | Representative(s) | Hautier IP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22743509.6 | 19.07.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022EP70243 | Priority number, date | FR20210007757 | 19.07.2021 Original published format: FR 2107757 | [2024/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023001838 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4374026 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, E04F13/08 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
E04F15/02044 (EP);
E04F15/02183 (EP);
E04F13/0826 (EP);
E04F2015/02094 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Title | German: | UNSICHTBARES BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2024/22] | English: | INVISIBLE ATTACHMENT SYSTEM | [2024/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FIXATION INVISIBLE | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 01.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003070368 (SHINGLETON JEFFERSON [US]); | [Y]US2012152326 (WEST JOHN RAYMOND [US], et al); | [Y]DE102011101567 (RENSBURG MARKUS [DE]); | [Y]US2015101997 (LIU JUN [US], et al); | [XY]EP2942451 (IHT LDA [PT]) | by applicant | US2012152326 | US2014096469 | EP2942451 |