EP4363869 - ABSENCE OF VOLTAGE DETECTION DEVICE FOR MEDIUM VOLTAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panduit Corp. 18900 Panduit Drive Tinley Park, Illinois 60487 / US | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLOURI-SARANSAR, Masud Orland Park, Illinois 60462 / US | 02 /
BALID, Walid Orland Park, Illinois 60467 / US | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22744011.2 | 21.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022US34304 | Priority number, date | US202163217835P | 02.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163217835 P | US202117517134 | 02.11.2021 Original published format: US202117517134 | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023278200 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4363869 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/155 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G01R19/155 (EP,US);
H02M3/07 (US);
H03H7/0115 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG DER ABWESENHEIT EINER SPANNUNG FÜR MITTELSPANNUNG | [2024/19] | English: | ABSENCE OF VOLTAGE DETECTION DEVICE FOR MEDIUM VOLTAGE | [2024/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'ABSENCE DE TENSION POUR TENSION MOYENNE | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 07.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010033190 (DEVINE CHRISTOPHER JAMES [AU]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]US10126335 (BOLOURI-SARANSAR MASUD [US], et al) [A] 4 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2019391186 (BOLLMAN ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XI]US2020348343 (BALID WALID [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 3, 9, 15, 16 * [I] 2,3,5 |