EP4370199 - TETHER ASSEMBLIES FOR MEDICAL DEVICE RETRIEVAL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 19.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRAKE, Ronald A. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 02 /
STENER, Lester O. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 03 /
COLIN, Brian P. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 04 /
YANG, Zhongping Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 05 /
ANDERSON, Thomas A. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22744073.2 | 24.06.2022 | [2024/21] | WO2022US34895 | Priority number, date | US202163221616P | 14.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163221616 P | US202217807081 | 15.06.2022 Original published format: US202217807081 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023287567 | Date: | 19.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4370199 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/375, A61B17/34, A61B17/50, A61B17/00, A61M25/00, A61N1/372 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
A61B17/3468 (EP,US);
A61N1/3756 (EP);
A61B2017/00323 (US);
A61M25/005 (US);
A61M25/0082 (US);
A61N1/362 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Title | German: | HALTEGURTANORDNUNGEN FÜR RÜCKHOLSYSTEME FÜR MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2024/21] | English: | TETHER ASSEMBLIES FOR MEDICAL DEVICE RETRIEVAL SYSTEMS | [2024/21] | French: | ENSEMBLES ATTACHES POUR SYSTÈMES DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL | [2024/21] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | 01.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018207430 (SOLTIS BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0059] - [0086]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2020345396 (RICKHEIM DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0049] - [0071] - [0075]; figures 3-6, 13 *; | [A]US2020353243 (DRAKE RONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0061] - [0102]; figures 2-6D *; | [A]US2021030439 (DRAKE RONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0021] - [0053]; figures 1-8 * |