EP4367315 - ELECTRICAL HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE HAVING AN IRONING AND/OR DECREASING TOOL AND A PORABLE BASE CONNECTED TO THE TOOL BY A CORD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB 69130 Ecully / FR | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOINE, Olivier 69134 ECULLY CEDEX / FR | 02 /
LAUCHET, Nicolas 69134 ECULLY CEDEX / FR | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | SEB Développement Direction Propriété industrielle - Brevets 112, chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB - CS 90229 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22744155.7 | 01.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022EP68342 | Priority number, date | FR20210007436 | 08.07.2021 Original published format: FR 2107436 | FR20220004297 | 06.05.2022 Original published format: FR 2204297 | [2024/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023280726 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4367315 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D06F73/00, D06F75/12 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
D06F73/00 (EP);
D06F75/12 (EP);
D06F75/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES HAUSHALTSGERÄT MIT BÜGEL- UND/ODER SENKWERKZEUG UND EINEM DURCH EINE SCHNUR MIT DEM WERKZEUG VERBUNDENEN PORIERBAREN SOCKEL | [2024/20] | English: | ELECTRICAL HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE HAVING AN IRONING AND/OR DECREASING TOOL AND A PORABLE BASE CONNECTED TO THE TOOL BY A CORD | [2024/20] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER COMPORTANT UN OUTIL DE REPASSAGE ET/OU DÉFROISSAGE ET UNE BASE PORTATIVE RELIÉE À L'OUTIL PAR UN CORDON | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 13.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US8291626 (YANG HONG S [US]) [Y] 9* figures 1-11 *; | [Y]WO2014013360 (LAURASTAR SA [CH]) [Y] 4-8,10 * figures 1-5 *; | [XAY]WO2020169653 (DE'LONGHI BRAUN HOUSEHOLD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1a-4, 9a-11b * [A] 2,3 [Y] 4-10 | by applicant | WO2014013360 |