EP4152903 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park No. 8089, Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Bin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Guotong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 03 /
MA, Dong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 22744364.5 | 21.04.2022 | [2023/12] | WO2022CN88272 | Priority number, date | CN202110878914 | 02.08.2021 Original published format: CN202110878914 | [2023/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023010895 | Date: | 09.02.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4152903 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.02.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, G06F1/16 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H04M1/0266 (EP,CN);
H04M1/026 (EP,CN);
H05K5/0217 (US);
G06F1/1626 (EP);
G06F1/1635 (EP);
G06F1/1637 (EP);
G06F1/1641 (EP,US);
G06F1/1647 (EP);
G06F1/1658 (EP);
H04M1/0277 (EP,CN);
H05K5/0086 (US);
H05K5/0247 (US);
H05K7/02 (CN);
H05K7/12 (CN);
H04M1/0214 (EP);
H04M1/0262 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/12] | H05K7/02, H05K7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/12] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2022 | Translation filed | 04.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 17.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2018131087 (KIM JUN-YOUNG [KR], et al); | [Y]CN111752053 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD) | International search | [A]US2017142837 (KIM JIHOON [KR], et al); | [A]CN106707577 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN107589579 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [XY]CN107728365 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [Y]WO2020133905 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]); | [Y]CN113095117 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD) |