EP4377703 - METHOD FOR THE SELF-DIAGNOSIS OF A CIRCUIT FOR MEASURING THE INSULATION RESISTANCE OF A HIGH-VOLTAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensor-Technik Wiedemann GmbH Am Bärenwald 6 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUSTER, Franz-Josef 87653 Eggenthal / DE | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22744466.8 | 15.07.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022EP69833 | Priority number, date | DE202110119830 | 30.07.2021 Original published format: DE102021119830 | [2024/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023006443 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4377703 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01R27/02, G01R35/00 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G01R27/025 (EP);
G01R35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EIGENDIAGNOSE EINER SCHALTUNG ZUR ISOLATIONSWIDERSTANDSMESSUNG EINES HOCHSPANNUNGSSYSTEMS | [2024/23] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SELF-DIAGNOSIS OF A CIRCUIT FOR MEASURING THE INSULATION RESISTANCE OF A HIGH-VOLTAGE SYSTEM | [2024/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AUTO-DIAGNOSTIC D'UN CIRCUIT POUR LA MESURE DE LA RÉSISTANCE D'ISOLEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME HAUTE TENSION | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 31.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20130112495 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20130112496 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]DE102016122115 (DRAEXLMAIER LISA GMBH [DE]); | [Y]CN108333548 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN109100618 (UNITED AUTOMOTIVE ELECT SYS CO); | [IY]WO2021051947 (CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2021085893 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | by applicant | EP1857825 |