EP4200192 - MINI STEERING MECHANISM INTEGRATED INTO SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hidromek-Hidrolik Ve Mekanik Makina Imalat Sanayi Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Ahi Evran OSB Mahallesi Osmanli Caddesi No:1. Sincan/Ankara / TR | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATAKUL, Furkan Ankara / TR | 02 /
TELISIK, Hakan Ankara / TR | 03 /
ÇIÇEK, Mehmet Ankara / TR | 04 /
YELKEN, Murat Ankara / TR | 05 /
BOZKURT, Mustafa Ankara / TR | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Kayahan, Senem Senem Kayahan Patent Danismanlik Ltd. Sti. Tepe Prime, Mustafa Kemal Mahallesi Dumlupinar Bulvari No: 266A, ic Kapi No: 18 06510 Çankaya, Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/26] | Yamankaradeniz, Kemal Destek Patent Inc. Maslak Mah. Büyükdere Cad., No: 243 Kat: 13, Spine Tower, Sariyer 34485 Istanbul / TR | Application number, filing date | 22744639.0 | 17.05.2022 | [2023/26] | WO2022TR50437 | Priority number, date | TR20210010447 | 25.06.2021 Original published format: TR 202110447 | [2023/26] | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022271122 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200192 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 29.12.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/18, B62D1/04, B60N2/75 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
B62D1/02 (EP);
B60N2/797 (EP);
E02F9/2004 (EP);
B62D1/04 (EP);
G05G9/047 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | B62D1/18, B62D1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | IM SITZ INTEGRIERTER MINI-LENKMECHANISMUS | [2023/26] | English: | MINI STEERING MECHANISM INTEGRATED INTO SEAT | [2023/26] | French: | MINI MÉCANISME DE DIRECTION INTÉGRÉ DANS UN SIÈGE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 18.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006061177 (BILLGER STEVEN C [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0014] - [0017]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2011025108 (WIHINEN KIMMO [FI]) [A] 1,2* paragraphs [0021] - [0027]; figure - * | International search | [A]DE19951379 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2801555 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]CN204323466U (SUZHOU PIONEER MATERIAL HANDLING EQUIPMENT & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-3* abstract, figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2020024026 | DE19991056870 |