EP4105187 - MICROCRYSTALLINE GLASS, AND MICROCRYSTALLINE GLASS PRODUCT AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Observations by third parties | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CDGM Glass Co. Ltd. No. 359 Sec.3 Chenglong Avenue Longquanyi District Chengdu, Sichuan 610100 / CN | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUAN, Baoping Chengdu, Sichuan 610100 / CN | 02 /
LI, Sai Chengdu, Sichuan 610100 / CN | 03 /
JIANG, Tao Chengdu, Sichuan 610100 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Xuemei Chengdu, Sichuan 610100 / CN | 05 /
YU, Tianlai Chengdu, Sichuan 610100 / CN | 06 /
SU, Yong Chengdu, Sichuan 610100 / CN | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 22744996.4 | 04.01.2022 | [2022/51] | WO2022CN70074 | Priority number, date | CN202110116889 | 28.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110116889 | [2022/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022161118 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4105187 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C03C10/04, C03C10/02, C03C10/12, C03C10/14, C03C1/04, C03C4/02, C03B32/02, C03C21/00, C03C3/097, C03B27/03, C03C4/00, C03B11/08, C03C10/00, C03B23/023 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
C03C10/0009 (EP);
C03C10/0027 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03B11/08 (EP);
C03B23/023 (EP);
C03B32/02 (EP);
C03C1/04 (KR);
C03C10/00 (EP);
C03C21/002 (EP);
C03C3/083 (US);
C03C3/085 (US);
C03C3/097 (EP);
C03C4/0092 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/51] | C03C10/04, C03C10/02, C03C10/12, C03C10/14, C03C1/04, C03C4/02, C03B32/02, C03C21/00, C03C3/097, C03B27/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MIKROKRISTALLINES GLAS, MIKROKRISTALLINES GLASPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/51] | English: | MICROCRYSTALLINE GLASS, AND MICROCRYSTALLINE GLASS PRODUCT AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/51] | French: | VERRE MICROCRISTALLIN, ET PRODUIT DE VERRE MICROCRISTALLIN ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2022 | Translation filed | 14.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2022 | Search fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 27.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2024 | Observations by third parties | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014200129 (DURSCHANG BERNHARD [DE], et al); | [X]US2018099900 (VOLLMANN MARKUS [DE], et al); | [X]WO2019167850 (AGC INC [JP]); | [X]WO2020018393 (CORNING INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2020150041 (CORNING INC [US]); | [X]US2020346969 (LI QING [JP], et al) | International search | [X]US5872069 (ABE MASAHIRO [JP]); | [XA]CN107847399 (DENTSPLY SIRONA INC, et al); | [X]CN107915412 (CDGM OPTICAL GLASS CO LTD); | [X]CN107963815 (CDGM OPTICAL GLASS CO LTD); | [X]CN108640526 (CHENGDU GUANGMING PHOTO ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]CN109867447 (CDGM OPTICAL GLASS CO LTD); | [XA]CN111417601 (CORNING INC); | [XA]WO2020150041 (CORNING INC [US]); | [X]WO2020161949 (AGC INC [JP]); | [PX]CN112876082 (LI QUN) | other | JP2005062832 | WO2017223551 | WO2019230889 | EP4197979 |